SIGHT SUPPORT HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 223668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Gray Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Enid Adams Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
Ann Massam Trustee 29 November 2016 None on record
CAROL WINTER Trustee 20 January 2014 None on record
James Houston Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
DAVID WILLIAM LONGMAN Trustee 27 January 2015 None on record
ERIC HARROD Trustee 18 January 2012 None on record
Malcolm Revell Trustee 30 July 2019 None on record
Michael Richard O Grady Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
HOLLIE KATE HAENEY Trustee 27 November 2012 None on record
ROBIN KENNETH RUSSELL Trustee 18 January 2012 None on record
Deborah Jane Rosenberg Chair 04 December 2013
SAILORS' CHILDREN'S SOCIETY Received: On time