ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CEREDIGION BRANCH

Charity number: 223675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 May 2017 On time Download