ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - CLWYD AND COLWYN BRANCH

Charity number: 223677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 November 2016 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 November 2016 28 days late Download