ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE NORTH EAST BRANCH

Charity number: 223679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £43.01k £64.77k £37.99k £35.23k £26.44k
Total expenditure £49.54k £33.26k £47.99k £28.65k £24.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A