OLDHAM SOCIETY FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 223729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required