RUGBY PHILHARMONIC CHOIR

Charity number: 223761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 20 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required