FOUR WINDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Four Winds Trust is to give those living in the cities a better chance to enjoy nature and the beauties of the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Lucy Cadbury-Simmons | Chair | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Clark | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arnold Geoffrey Bull | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE LUCY ANNE CADBURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN GILLETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £28.39k | £44.28k | £16.97k | £39.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.53k | £24.15k | £28.23k | £24.80k | £42.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 24TH JUNE 1943
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK PROPER AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT RESTRICTING THRE GENERAL DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, FOR THE ACQUISITION OF LAND BY THE NATIONAL TRUST OR FOR THE PROVISION AND UPKEEP OF YOUTH HOSTELS OR SPECIAL HOLIDAY CAMPS OR FOR ANY OBJECT CALCULATED TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLE TO ENJOY THE BEAUTIES AND JOYS OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND PRESERVE THE OPEN COUNTRY AND RURAL AMENITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Three Elms Road
HEREFORD
HR4 0RH
- Phone:
- 07753619356
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window