ALVESTON VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 223913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 13 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 10 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required