READING ROOM FUND

Charity number: 223973
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.61k £29.10k £20.34k £10.70k £11.62k
Total expenditure £3.24k £25.21k £17.46k £18.10k £11.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A