Accounts and annual returns WOODHEAD AND PENNYFEATHER CHARITY

Charity number: 223993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required