Financial history BAMPTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 224015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.43k £13.04k £16.51k £17.82k £24.11k
Total expenditure £10.57k £7.73k £12.07k £20.32k £6.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £341 £290 £207 £225
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.67k