THE HOLME-UPON-SPALDING MOOR RELIEF IN NEED AND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holme On Spalding Moor Relief in Need and Education Charity gives financial assistance for those in need and for educational purposes to residents of Holme On Spalding Moor only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 July 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Victor Cope Rev. Canon | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
HELEN LOUISE WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 16 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Laverack | Trustee | 21 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MARSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ERNEST SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SOUTHGATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN DOWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.59k | £14.10k | £15.36k | £19.28k | £19.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.21k | £13.47k | £16.49k | £19.13k | £19.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 JULY 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HOLME-UPON-SPALDING AND MOOR WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. IF AND SO FAR AS INCOME CANNOT BE APPLIED THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF CHILDREN WHO ATTEND ANY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLME-UPON-SPALDING MOOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 CHAPEL FIELDS
HOLME-ON-SPALDING-MOOR
YORK
YO43 4DH
- Phone:
- 01430860837
- Email:
- sheila@parch.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window