LYNN WOOD APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 224059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 12 May 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 13 June 2017 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required