YORKSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 224083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £138.28k £602.77k £92.89k £90.57k £100.07k
Total expenditure £84.75k £139.39k £68.98k £47.53k £48.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £10.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £39.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £1.64k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £19.65k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £533.06k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £274 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £139.39k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.50k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A