YORKSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 224083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Alexander Myles Gibson Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record
Dr David John Buck Trustee 31 May 2014 None on record
MARGARET TYLEE Trustee 20 August 2016
SOUTH YORKSHIRE INDUSTRIAL HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
David Asquith Chair 26 September 2015 None on record
Gary Robert Brannan Trustee 24 October 2020
MUSIC PRESERVED Received: On time
Ian Daniel Roberts Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
SYLVIA THOMAS Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD WILLIAM HOYLE Trustee 24 October 2020
VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY (SHROPSHIRE) LIMITED Received: On time
Dr Gill Cookson Trustee 13 November 2013 None on record
Axel Erhard Wilhelm Muller Trustee 07 December 2018 None on record
DAVID BREAR Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
Kirsty Anne Louise Cox Trustee 19 June 2021 None on record