ASHTON-IN-MAKERFIELD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 224117
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making the community centre available for community activities including community coffee morning; karate for all ages; sequence dancing; ladies choir; dementia cafe; Alzheimer society; charity events; family celebrations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £133
Total expenditure: £1,367

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1964: Standard registration
  • 07 March 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 07 March 2022: Funds transferred to 513400 WIGAN AND LEIGH HOSPICE
  • 07 March 2022: Funds transferred to 214779 THE SALVATION ARMY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.10k £6.68k £4.65k £5.38k £133
Total expenditure £4.01k £5.36k £7.92k £3.82k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required