THE GEORGE LAWES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 224118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help the maintenance, education and/or advancement and/or otherwise of the poor and deserving children of Rishton below the age of 21.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £657
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Ethan Rawcliffe Trustee 23 May 2024
RISHTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
RISHTON RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
Councillor Kate Walsh Trustee 23 May 2024
RISHTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
RISHTON RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
Steve Colling Trustee 01 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £496 £519 £511 £544 £657
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SCAITCLIFFE HOUSE
ORMEROD STREET
ACCRINGTON
LANCASHIRE
BB5 0PF
Phone:
01254388111
Website:

No information available