Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL NATIONAL THEATRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 8 FEBRUARY 1963 AS AMENDED ON THE 10 MAY 1965 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAY 1996, 26 MARCH 2001,15 JULY 2002, 26 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 19 JULY 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION SO FAR AS SUCH PROMOTION AND ASSISTANCE SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE AND IN PARTICULAR, SO FAR AS OF A CHARITABLE NATURE, TO PROCURE AND INCREASE THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE DRAMATIC ART IN ALL ITS FORMS AS A MEMORIAL TO WILLIAM SHAKESPEARE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.