HALIFAX SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 224258
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We offer sight loss specific information, support, advice and specialist equipment in our extensive sight centre to promote the independence of people with sight loss. We also have social groups in Brighouse and Halifax, regular Zoom groups, Tenpin bowling group, Local Eating Out Group (LEO), volunteering opportunities, AVIATORS scheme, newsletter and audio magazine, occasional day trips & more.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £172,518
Total expenditure: £152,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1964: Standard registration
  • 16 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £247.43k £174.03k £86.52k £172.52k £172.52k
Total expenditure £126.31k £140.94k £118.53k £152.04k £152.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 27 OCTOBER 1953
Charitable objects
RELIEVING AND ASSISTING ACCORDING TO THEIR SEVERAL NECESSITIES BLIND PERSONS WHO HAVE LIVED FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF SUCH APPLICATION IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF HALIFAX.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF HALIFAX
Registration history
  • 04 February 1964 : Standard registration
  • 16 February 2022 : Removed