Trustees THE GREAT STONE BRIDGE TRUST OF EDENBRIDGE

Charity number: 224309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Crothall Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
Peter Stephen Brook Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Dr Simon Morrison Trustee 28 July 2021
None on record
Alan Paul Smart Trustee 24 July 2019
EDEN VALLEY MUSEUM TRUST
Overdue by 134 days
EDENBRIDGE PARISH CHURCH PRESERVATION FUND
Received: On time
Margot Virginia McArthur Trustee 24 July 2019
None on record
Robert Todd Trustee 08 January 2018
THE NORMAN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Julie Elizabeth Johnson Trustee 16 September 2015
None on record
BEN BROWNLESS Trustee 16 July 2014
None on record
GILES JACKMAN Trustee
None on record
JOHN HODSON Trustee
THE FOUR ELMS PARISH ROOM
Received: On time
ROY CUNNINGTON Trustee
THE ROTARY CLUB OF EDENBRIDGE AND WESTERHAM TRUST FUND
Received: On time