ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PEMBROKESHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 224339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £23.00k £47.13k £25.26k £65.27k £27.29k
Total expenditure £29.25k £18.43k £7.76k £15.99k £43.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A