ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ABERCONWY BRANCH

Charity number: 224340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time Download