Accounts and annual returns ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH OFFICERS WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 224343
Charity reporting is overdue by 257 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 257 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 257 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required