ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH OFFICERS WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 224343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Terenja Humphries Chair 01 January 2017
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Jessica Tabois BSc Hons Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Roisin Kerr Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Vanessa Kim Wardle Trustee 01 January 2021
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Maurice Brennan Trustee 01 January 2020
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
David Newsum BSc Hons Trustee 01 January 2019
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Madhumathi Murali Trustee 25 June 2020
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Julie Ann Barratt Trustee 01 January 2021
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Daniel Oerther Trustee 01 January 2020
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Kirpal Tahim FCCA, MBA Trustee 01 January 2019
CITIZENS ADVICE HILLINGDON LTD Received: On time
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
Sterling Mitchel Crew Trustee 01 January 2021
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time
NICHOLAS JAMES PAHL Trustee 27 April 2017
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH Received: On time