Accounts and annual returns PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 224423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 November 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 February 2020 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 November 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required