THE NEW ENGLAND COMPANY

Charity number: 224425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 December 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 December 2019 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On time Download