THE NEW ENGLAND COMPANY

Charity number: 224425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £450.59k £436.40k £363.08k £371.50k £323.88k
Total expenditure £460.99k £503.79k £556.05k £546.85k £582.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A