THE WIGAN DEAF AND WITHOUT SPEECH SOCIETY

Charity number: 224494
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 December 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required