THE WIGAN DEAF AND WITHOUT SPEECH SOCIETY

Charity number: 224494
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £13.93k £2.24k £1.96k £1.24k £2.02k
Total expenditure £8.98k £3.79k £2.33k £1.84k £5.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A