HUDDERSFIELD AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 224530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Regan Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
Jennifer Dodds Trustee 16 February 2018 None on record
Louise Redpath Chair 10 May 2020 None on record
Susan Bradley Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
Alison Brown Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Jake Lamb Trustee 27 October 2013 None on record