GERTRUDE MACKENNAL TRUST

Charity number: 224805
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £1.67k £1.65k £1.26k £1.24k £1.29k
Total expenditure £2.81k £3.62k £1.44k £1.35k £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A