Trustees ST HELEN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 224869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANNE JACQUELINE MAUGHAN Chair 23 August 2011
None on record
Rebecca Frances White Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Erica Ruth Tarney Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Gareth James Cozens Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
William David Kerr Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Nicola Atkinson Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
MARK ALAN BROWN Trustee
None on record