THE GREAT YARMOUTH DEAF CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE GREAT YARMOUTH DEAF HAS CLOSE ITS ACCOUNT AND IS BEING WITHDRAWN AS A CHARITY. THE CLUB CEASED TO EXIT AS FROM JULY 1ST 2020
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 August 1963: Standard registration
- 09 July 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GREAT YARMOUTH DEAF CLUB (Working name)
- GREAT YARMOUTH DEAF AND DUMB WELFARE COUNCIL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206 | £413 | £333 | £14 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £330 | £1.68k | £60 | £60 | £10.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 04 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28-7-1953
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELL-BEING OF DEAF AND DUMB PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF GREAT YARMOUTH.
Area of benefit
GREAT YARMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window