Accounts and annual returns THE GARLTHORPE CHARITY

Charity number: 224927
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 23 April 2020 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 April 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2019 Not Required