Accounts and annual returns MARY PEASE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 225036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 09 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 09 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required