GARGRAVE POOR'S LANDS

Charity number: 225067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Annual return 05 April 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 18 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download