GARGRAVE POOR'S LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance to any permanent resident of Gargrave, Eshton, Flasby, Coniston Cold, Banknewton or Winterburn provided that, in the trustees' opinion, any such assistance is justified by the circumstances of the case. This assistance may be by way of grant or loan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 April 1964: Standard registration
- POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP DAVID ELLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sharon Aldous | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JOAN CHARLTON | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.50k | £14.48k | £22.51k | £29.70k | £32.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.15k | £25.20k | £23.50k | £19.59k | £38.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ANCIENT CHARITY SEE YORK W.R. VOL.52.P.343 P R.V. 13 P.632.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF GARGRAVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Skipton Road
Gargrave
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 3SA
- Phone:
- 07907 308313
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window