FOUNTAIN'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 225068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 19 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 11 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 05 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 21 September 2016 On time Download