FOUNTAIN'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 225068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £49.81k £51.93k £52.74k £63.28k £56.45k
Total expenditure £37.61k £53.46k £50.28k £53.91k £51.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A