YORK CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 225087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £894.98k £1.06m £1.10m £1.17m £1.09m
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.09m £1.10m £1.15m £1.01m
Income from government contracts £175.71k £257.44k £413.37k £403.06k £76.88k
Income from government grants £53.90k £218.85k £70.76k £201.18k £318.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.12k £2.95k £2.76k £2.33k £2.05k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £427.41k £416.91k £0 £120.07k
Income - Charitable activities £887.51k £627.92k £677.06k £1.16m £937.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.35k £3.08k £5.86k £2.60k £2.84k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.09m £1.10m £1.15m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £8.35k £9.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.00k £0 £0 £68.97k £44.22k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0