YORK CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 225087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew William Knight Trustee 09 October 2019
OLDER CITIZENS ADVOCACY YORK Received: On time
Luke Norbury Trustee 18 September 2019
Home Instead Charities UK Received: On time
Rachel Jane Hicks Trustee 16 December 2020
BOOTHAM SCHOOL Received: On time
THE HEWORTH MOOR HOUSE TRUST Received: On time
David William Harbourne Chair 07 August 2019 None on record
Benjamin David Hastings Vulliamy Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
Jonah Alfred Hebron Trustee 12 December 2018 None on record
Dr Evangeline Tsao Trustee 16 December 2020 None on record
Lesley Jacqueline Ruth Hayward Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Katie Louise Speed Trustee 18 September 2019 None on record
Richard Weston Trustee 19 September 2018
YORK MIND (INCORPORATING OUR CELEBRATION) LTD Received: On time