FRANCES DARLINGTON CHARITY

Charity number: 225140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 November 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 December 2018 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 November 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required