Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM BANKES CHARITY

Charity number: 225147
Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Annual return 25 April 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 April 2021 22 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 April 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 25 April 2019 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2019 Not Required