NEW VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 225178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher James Walls Trustee 05 March 2013 None on record
Doreen Dean Chair
THE BARTON TURF COMMUNITY CHARITIES Received: On time
Michael Eric Godfrey Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
IAN MCFADYEN Trustee
IAFRICA FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ZAMBEZI EDUCATION AND CONSERVATION TRUST Received: On time
MRS DOLLY NEWCOMBE BEM Trustee
NEATISHEAD, BARTON TURF AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Robin James Fletcher Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
HUGH CARL McGILL Trustee
CITY OF NORWICH ATHLETIC CLUB Received: On time
CHERYL ANN PELL Trustee 27 March 2013 None on record
Mark Adrian Clayton Trustee 31 March 2020 None on record
SIMON CLAYTON Trustee 13 October 2015 None on record
JILL PATRICIA BAZIRE Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record