ORGANISTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 225326
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.48k £9.68k £11.23k £10.93k £11.24k
Total expenditure £8.16k £11.02k £8.14k £5.03k £12.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A