Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM WALTER FELLOWSHIPS

Charity number: 225432
Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 337 days
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 337 days
Annual return 16 July 2021 20 September 2022 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 16 July 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 16 July 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 16 July 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2018 Not Required