Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS GWENT BRANCH

Charity number: 225476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.63k £39.34k £38.07k £96.25k £279.50k
Total expenditure £33.43k £34.20k £18.79k £69.33k £169.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £29.69k