ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SHEFFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 225570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY PARKIN Trustee 18 August 2014 None on record
Lewis Kerry Trustee 09 September 2021 None on record
Nicky Swire Trustee 09 September 2021 None on record
Carla Buckley Trustee 17 December 2019 None on record
Laura Laver Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
Uday Nair Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Paul Antony Galloway Chair 23 October 2017 None on record