RSPCA HALIFAX, HUDDERSFIELD, BRADFORD & DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal Welfare Society - a branch of the RSPCA operating in the Halifax, Huddersfield and Bradford areas. The branch has an animal centre in Halifax where we take in animals in greatest welfare need, often rescued from neglect and ill-treatment. We provide them a safe haven with veterinary treatment and care, we rehabilitate their behavior before finding them loving new homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,378,969
Donations and legacies | £641.68k | |
Charitable activities | £192.55k | |
Other trading activities | £1.49m | |
Investments | £50.62k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,170,413
Raising funds | £1.10m | |
Charitable activities | £1.07m | |
Other | £2.67k |
£28,061 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.10m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.07m | |
Retained for future use | £208.56k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.10m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.07m | |
Retained for future use | £236.62k |
People

60 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
411 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 31 October 1963: Standard registration
- 04 June 2019: Funds received from 232211 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
- RSPCA HALIFAX AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HALIFAX AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HALIFAX, HUDDERSFIELD AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA HALIFAX & DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA -HALIFAX BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Brimble | Chair | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael David Williams | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Evans | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Carol Watkinson | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cordingley | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHRYN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIEN ASPEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66m | £1.80m | £1.91m | £2.85m | £2.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.85m | £1.63m | £1.68m | £1.99m | £2.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £338.02k | £232.11k | £22.38k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £266.77k | £880.05k | £650.79k | £1.20m | £641.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.15m | £728.62k | £1.11m | £1.48m | £1.49m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £223.43k | £172.97k | £140.12k | £153.05k | £192.55k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £24.51k | £22.73k | £12.94k | £14.57k | £50.62k | |
|
Income - Other | £373 | £34 | £250 | £206 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £166.21k | £352.94k | £320.38k | £988.74k | £530.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £932.03k | £827.71k | £825.29k | £955.60k | £1.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £921.26k | £798.40k | £858.13k | £1.04m | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.79k | £5.98k | £10.96k | £7.18k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.67k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £317.42k | £467.88k | £468.54k | £502.22k | £472.53k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.61m | £1.57m | £1.67m | £1.65m | £1.67m | |
|
Other assets | £1.19m | £1.44m | £1.58m | £2.45m | £2.68m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £99.72k | £87.80k | £59.71k | £106.72k | £97.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009. AS AMENDED ON 27 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
HALIFAX, HUDDERSFIELD AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
R S P C A Animal Centre
Wade Street
HALIFAX
HX1 1SN
- Phone:
- 01422 365628
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window