EDGE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 225610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.03k £23.17k £7.88k £6.32k £1.85k
Total expenditure £3.36k £30.83k £10.59k £5.70k £2.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A